MA H3949 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4053
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Senate concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Senate concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act authorizing the city of Peabody to grant ten additional all alcoholic beverages licenses By Representatives Speliotis of Danvers and Cole of Peabody, a petition of Theodore C. Speliotis, Leah Cole and Joan B. Lovely (with the approval of the mayor and city council) that the city of Peabody be authorized to grant ten additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Peabody to grant ten additional all alcoholic beverages licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-04-22 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4053 |
2014-04-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/08/2014 from 02:30 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2014-04-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/08/2014 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4053 (Replaced by) 2014-06-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 133 of the Acts of 2014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3949 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3949.pdf |