MA H3950 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the Supplemental Reserve Fund to Ensure Fiscal Stability in the town of Swansea. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
RELATIVE TO THE SUPPLEMENTAL RESERVE FUND TO ENSURE FISCAL STABILITY IN THE TOWN OF SWANSEA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-04-24 | House | Enacted |
2012-04-23 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-04-17 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-04-04 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-04-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-03-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-03-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/08/2012 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3950 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=91638&generalCourtId=1 |