MA H3951 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3903
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-15 - Text of amendment, see H3903
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-15 - Text of amendment, see H3903
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Similar Bills
Title
Similar Bills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-15 | House | Text of amendment, see H3903 |
Same As/Similar To
H3903 (Replaced by) 2021-07-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2021
H3852 (Similar To) 2021-06-21 - New draft substituted, see H3903
H57 (Similar To) 2021-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3852
H4358 (Similar To) 2022-03-30 - New draft substituted, see H4638
H4638 (Similar To) 2022-06-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 89 of the Acts of 2022
H3852 (Similar To) 2021-06-21 - New draft substituted, see H3903
H57 (Similar To) 2021-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3852
H4358 (Similar To) 2022-03-30 - New draft substituted, see H4638
H4638 (Similar To) 2022-06-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 89 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3951 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3951.pdf |