MA H3952 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the practice of sheet metal work. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to sheet metal work
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-01-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/26/2016 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-01-13 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported,rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2015-09-17 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H778 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H536 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H2709 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H305 (Similar To) 2016-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H2710 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H536 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H2709 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H305 (Similar To) 2016-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H2710 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3952 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3952.pdf |