MA H3954 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4351
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-30 - New draft substituted, see H4351
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-30 - New draft substituted, see H4351
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to regulating insurance for portable electronic devices. Financial Services.
Title
Regulating Portable Electronics Insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-30 | House | New draft substituted, see H4351 |
2012-07-30 | House | Read second |
2012-07-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-07-30 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2012-07-30 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2012-07-30 | House | Committee recommends ought to pass with an amendment substituting a bill with the same title, H4351 |
2012-04-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-03-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/15/2012 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in B-2 |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-02-15 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H4351 (Replaced by) 2012-12-17 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3954 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17999&generalCourtId=1 |