MA H3955 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate a certain pedestrian bridge in the city of Revere as the Christina Markey and John Markey Memorial Pedestrian Bridge and to designate a certain maintenance facility located in said city as the Captain Arthur “Icy” Reinstein Memorial Maintenance Facility. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Designating a Certain Pedestrian Bridge in the City of Revere as the Christina Markey and John Markey Memorial Pedestrian Bridge and the new maintenance facility for the Department of Conservation and Recreation located in the city of Revere as the Captain Arthur “Icy” Reinstein Memorial Maintenance Facility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-05-09 | House | Enacted |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-04-12 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2012-04-04 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-03-22 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-03-22 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-03-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-02-15 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2012-02-06 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3955 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17935&generalCourtId=1 |