MA H3955 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on October 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-13 - Placed on file, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-13 - Placed on file, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Communication from the Division of Energy Resources of the Executive Office of Energy and Environmental Affairs (under the provisions of section 12 of Chapter 25A of the General Laws) submitting amendments to 225 CMR 16, Alternative Energy Portfolio Standard (APS). Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Communication from the Division of Energy Resources of the Executive Office of Energy and Environmental Affairs (under the provisions of section 12 of Chapter 25A of the General Laws) submitting amendments to 225 CMR 16, Alternative Energy Portfolio Standard (APS). Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #352 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-13 | House | Placed on file, in concurrence |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Report accepted and sent to the House for its information |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-10-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H2930 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4278
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3955 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3955.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/190/SenateRollCall352.pdf |