MA H3957 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5174
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on July 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5174
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5174
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to compelling the president and fellows of Harvard College to divest from fossil fuel. Higher Education.
Title
Compelling the president and fellows of Harvard College to divest from fossil fuel
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Connolly [D] | Rep. Erika Uyterhoeven [D] | Rep. Michelle DuBois [D] | Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] |
Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Rep. Jay Livingstone [D] | Rep. Natalie Higgins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5174 |
2021-10-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-07-14 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H5174 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3957 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3957.pdf |