MA H396 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4590
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing expanded learning time for students. Education.
Title
To accelerate student success through expanded learning time
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Haddad [D] | Rep. Carole Fiola [D] | Rep. Paul Donato [D] | Rep. Aaron Vega [D] |
Sen. Michael Rodrigues [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4590 |
2015-09-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/16/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4590 (Replaced by) 2016-08-25 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H993 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4636
H1973 (Similar To) 2016-07-23 - Senate concurred
H1792 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H513 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H391 (Similar To) 2016-09-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 255 of the Acts of 2016
H993 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4636
H1973 (Similar To) 2016-07-23 - Senate concurred
H1792 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H513 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H391 (Similar To) 2016-09-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 255 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H396 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H396.pdf |