MA H396 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5159
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the appointment of retired police officers as school resource officers. Education.
Title
Relative to school resource officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5159 |
2019-08-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S317 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S320 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3262 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2200 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2240
S2240 (Similar To) 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2019
H4022 (Similar To) 2019-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2019
H4273 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2020
H5159 (Replaced by) 2020-12-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S320 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3262 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2200 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2240
S2240 (Similar To) 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2019
H4022 (Similar To) 2019-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2019
H4273 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2020
H5159 (Replaced by) 2020-12-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H396 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H396.pdf |