MA H3964 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 53 of the Acts of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 53 of the Acts of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt Joanne Ricardelli from the maximum age requirement for appointment as a firefighter in the town of Wilmington. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Exempting Joanne Ricardelli from the maximum age requirements for firefighters in the town of Wilmington
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-12 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 53 of the Acts of 2023 | |
2023-10-05 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2023-10-04 | House | Enacted |
2023-10-02 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2023-10-02 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2023-08-31 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-08-31 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2023-08-17 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2023-08-14 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-07-31 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-07-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-07-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-07-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2023 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2023-07-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-07-03 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3964 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3964.pdf |