MA H3973 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3844
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 265 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 265 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the conveyance of a certain parcel of land in the town of Grafton for the Massachusetts State Police Museum and Learning Center
Title
Authorizing the conveyance of a certain parcel of land in the town of Grafton for the Massachusetts State Police Museum and Learning Center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-16 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 265 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-09-08 | House | Enacted |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2016-09-08 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2016-09-06 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2016-08-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means), ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-06-09 | House | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2016-01-27 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-01-27 | House | New draft of H3844 |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending new draft of H3844 |
2016-01-25 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H3844 (Replaces) 2016-01-27 - New draft substituted, see H3973
H65 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Reported by H3333
H66 (Similar To) 2015-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2015
H3189 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H3203 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - House insisted on its amendment
H3773 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Published as amended, see H3785
H65 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Reported by H3333
H66 (Similar To) 2015-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2015
H3189 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H3203 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - House insisted on its amendment
H3773 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Published as amended, see H3785
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3973 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3973.pdf |