MA H3977 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Lynnfield be authorized to change the date of the annual town election of said town. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the Lynnfield town charter
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2017 | |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-12-28 | House | Enacted |
2017-12-26 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2017-12-26 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2017-12-04 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2017-11-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-30 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-11-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-10-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-10-25 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H3972 (Similar To) 2017-11-07 - Amendment #1 (Jones) adopted
H1852 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3976 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4289
H3930 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2018
H1097 (Similar To) 2017-09-28 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3930
H4010 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 121 of the Acts of 2017
H4102 (Similar To) 2018-10-25 - Enacted
H4289 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4370
H4370 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2018
H1852 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3976 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4289
H3930 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2018
H1097 (Similar To) 2017-09-28 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3930
H4010 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 121 of the Acts of 2017
H4102 (Similar To) 2018-10-25 - Enacted
H4289 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4370
H4370 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3977 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3977.pdf |