MA H398 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4291
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4291
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4291
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the mandatory minimum age for children to attend kindergarten. Education.
Title
Relative to changing the minimum age requirement for kindergarten
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4291 |
2019-07-01 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-06-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H413 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4291
H414 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4291
S265 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S240 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H4291 (Replaced by) 2020-01-15 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H414 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4291
S265 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S240 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H4291 (Replaced by) 2020-01-15 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H398 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H398.pdf |