MA H3980 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4967
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on July 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4967
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4967
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To promote commercial driver safety
Title
To promote commercial driver safety
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-14 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4967 |
2020-09-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-08-31 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday September 11, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-07-29 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Transportation |
2020-07-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-29 | House | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2020-07-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-07-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday July 20, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-06-01 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday July 2, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-27 | House | House concurred |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 25, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 4, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-12-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/02/2020 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-07-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-07-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S39 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2532
S2301 (Similar To) 2019-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2019
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2137 (Similar To) 2020-07-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2806
S2098 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2433 (Similar To) 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2843
H4967 (Replaced by) 2020-09-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2301 (Similar To) 2019-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2019
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2137 (Similar To) 2020-07-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2806
S2098 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2433 (Similar To) 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2843
H4967 (Replaced by) 2020-09-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3980 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3980.pdf |