MA H3984 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4707
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4707
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4707
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the teaching of health education in schools. Education.
Title
Relative to providing health education in schools
Sponsors
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D] | Sen. Harriette Chandler [D] | Rep. Michelle DuBois [D] | Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D] |
Rep. Solomon Goldstein-Rose [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4707 |
2018-01-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/16/2018 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-10-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-10-25 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S2112 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2113 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Reprinted as amended, see S2128
S2128 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S216 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
H2312 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4707 (Replaced by) 2018-07-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2113 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Reprinted as amended, see S2128
S2128 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S216 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
H2312 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4707 (Replaced by) 2018-07-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3984 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3984.pdf |