MA H3988 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4654
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to retirement benefits for Brian P. Costello, Jr. Public Service.
Title
Relative to retirement benefits for Brian P. Costello Jr
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Cusack [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4654 |
2017-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/07/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-10-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-10-26 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H1436 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1461 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3300 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1482 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1429 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4915 (Similar To) 2018-10-11 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4928
H4933 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 406 of the Acts of 2018
H1461 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3300 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1482 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1429 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4915 (Similar To) 2018-10-11 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4928
H4933 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 406 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3988 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3988.pdf |