MA H3992 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to exempting municipalities from the annual compliance assurance fee. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Amending MGL 21E AND 310 CMR 4.03
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Mark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-04-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2014 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-03-26 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3992 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3992.pdf |