MA H3998 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 118 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 118 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to amending chapter 413 of the Acts of 1991 authorizing the city council of the city of Cambridge to amend chapter 14.04 of the Cambridge municipal code entitled "Fair Housing"
Title
Relative to amending chapter 413 of the Acts of 1991 authorizing the city council of the city of Cambridge to amend chapter 14.04 of the Cambridge municipal code entitled "Fair Housing"
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-21 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 118 of the Acts of 2019 | |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2019-11-13 | House | Enacted |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-07-29 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2019-07-25 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2019-07-25 | House | Substituted for H1775 |
Same As/Similar To
H1775 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3998
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3998 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3998.pdf |