MA H401 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4299
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4299
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4299
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Hill of Ipswich, a petition of Bradford R. Hill and others that costs associated with special education follow students upon the change of school districts in mid year. Education.
Title
Relative to special education funding reform
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4299 |
2015-07-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4299 (Replaced by) 2016-05-16 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3140 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4084
H201 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H2755 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2753 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H1376 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3140 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4084
H201 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H2755 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2753 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H1376 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H401 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H401.pdf |