MA H4012 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4367
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 276 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 276 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the appointment of special police officers in the town of Dracut. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the appointment of special police officers in the town of Dracut
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 276 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-09-22 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-09-22 | House | Enacted |
2016-09-22 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-09-22 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2016-08-18 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2016-06-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-06-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-06-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-06-23 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-06-09 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Public Service |
2016-06-09 | House | Reported on a part of H4367 |
2016-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4367 |
2016-02-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/24/2016 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4367 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Reported, in part, by H4012
H385 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H382 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H146 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4120
H191 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H1321 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H385 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H382 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H146 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4120
H191 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H1321 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4012 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4012.pdf |