MA H4015 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 133 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 133 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for immediate capital improvement needs of the Commonwealth
Title
Providing for immediate capital improvement needs of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-11-15 - House - House On Enactment State loan Yea and Nay No. 302 (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-15 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call # 313 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-11-08 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 280 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-15 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call # 313 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-11-08 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 280 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-21 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 133 of the Acts of 2017 | |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #313 (Yeas 33 to Nays 0) |
2017-11-15 | House | Passed to be enacted - 153 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 302) |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2017-11-15 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Senate receded from its amendment |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-11-15 | House | House NON-concurred in the Senate amendment |
2017-11-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, amended, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-11-08 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 156 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 280) |
2017-11-08 | House | Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-11-08 | House | Read third |
2017-11-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-08 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-11-08 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-11-08 | House | Reported on a part of H3968 |
2017-11-08 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H752 (Similar To) 2018-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4235
H3730 (Similar To) 2017-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3968
H3968 (Similar To) 2017-11-13 - New draft substituted, see H4018
H1152 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1335 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4017 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4235 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3730 (Similar To) 2017-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3968
H3968 (Similar To) 2017-11-13 - New draft substituted, see H4018
H1152 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1335 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4017 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4235 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken