MA H4017 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4727
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4727
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4727
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a public higher education facilities modernization and reconstruction trust fund with certain dedicated sales tax revenue. Revenue.
Title
To support higher education infrastructure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4727 |
2023-09-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-07-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-07-26 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4142 (Similar To) 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4713
S1819 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2687
H4266 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4267 (Similar To) 2024-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4286 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4727 (Replaced by) 2024-06-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1819 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2687
H4266 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4267 (Similar To) 2024-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4286 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4727 (Replaced by) 2024-06-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4017 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4017.pdf |