MA H4019 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on September 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 276 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on September 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 276 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Kafka of Stoughton, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Louis L. Kafka and others for the issuance of an annual proclamation by the Governor establishing the third week in October as Male Breast Cancer Awareness Week. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Designating Male Breast Cancer Awareness Week
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-12 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 276 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-09-04 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-09-04 | House | Enacted |
2012-09-04 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-09-04 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-08-30 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2012-08-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-08-27 | Senate | Read second (amended), ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-08-27 | Senate | Rule suspended |
2012-08-27 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-07-30 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2012-06-25 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-06-13 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-06-11 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-06-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-05-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/24/2012 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2012-04-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-03-19 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2012-01-26 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4019 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17799&generalCourtId=1 |