MA H4019 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-13 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-13 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Speliotis of Danvers, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 1948). November 8, 2017.
Title
Authorizing any town or city to designate a check-off box on certain tax bills to fund a Veterans Memorial and Patriotic Celebration Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-13 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-08 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 155 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 278) |
2017-11-08 | House | Substituted for H1948 |
Same As/Similar To
S2135 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2764 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1618 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H2624 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3318 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2764 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1618 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H2624 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3318 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4019 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4019.pdf |