MA H4025 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Speliotis of Danvers, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 3937). November 9, 2017.
Title
Designating a certain bridge in the city of Haverhill as the U.S. Navy Petty Officer Caitlin E. Trask - Veterans of the War on Terror Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-01-16 | House | Enacted |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-01-16 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2017-11-13 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2017-11-09 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2017-11-09 | House | Substituted for H3937 |
Same As/Similar To
H3646 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3937
H3937 (Similar To) 2017-11-09 - Amendment #1 (Speliotis) adopted
H3900 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 101 of the Acts of 2017
H3960 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 131 of the Acts of 2017
H1809 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2017
H4149 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H4156 (Similar To) 2018-03-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 53 of the Acts of 2018
S1985 (Similar To) 2018-04-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2018
H3425 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Accompanied S1985
H3937 (Similar To) 2017-11-09 - Amendment #1 (Speliotis) adopted
H3900 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 101 of the Acts of 2017
H3960 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 131 of the Acts of 2017
H1809 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2017
H4149 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H4156 (Similar To) 2018-03-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 53 of the Acts of 2018
S1985 (Similar To) 2018-04-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2018
H3425 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Accompanied S1985
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4025 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4025.pdf |