MA H4025 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Marshfield be authorized to grant three additional liquor licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises and three additional licenses for alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises in said town. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Related to granting three additional liquor licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk off the premises in the town of Marshfield and three additional licenses for alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises in the town of Marshfield
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/25/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2023-08-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-07-31 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3356 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2074 (Similar To) 2023-07-03 - Accompanied S1317
S1317 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - New draft (O'Connor) substituted, see S2715
H4108 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2715 (Similar To) 2024-08-15 - Read third, amended by substitution of a new text (H5001) and passed to be engrossed
H2074 (Similar To) 2023-07-03 - Accompanied S1317
S1317 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - New draft (O'Connor) substituted, see S2715
H4108 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2715 (Similar To) 2024-08-15 - Read third, amended by substitution of a new text (H5001) and passed to be engrossed
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4025 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4025.pdf |