MA H4028 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2065
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-08 - Accompanied S2065
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-08 - Accompanied S2065
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the board of health in the city of Worcester By Mr. O'Day of West Boylston, a petition of James J. O'Day (with the approval of the mayor and city council) that the city of Worcester be authorized to establish a board of health for said city. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the board of health in the city of Worcester
Sponsors
Rep. James O'Day [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-08 | Senate | Accompanied S2065 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-04-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2065 (Replaced by) 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 120 of the Acts of 2014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4028 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4028.pdf |