MA H4033 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5026
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to special election scheduling. Election Laws.
Title
Relative to special election scheduling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5026 |
2021-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-07-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-07-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S1236 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4698
S1235 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4698
H1974 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4698
H4698 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5026 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1235 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4698
H1974 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4698
H4698 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5026 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4033 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4033.pdf |