MA H4036 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1391
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on July 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to burial alternatives that protect the environment. Public Health.
Title
Relative to environmentally-friendly burial alternatives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-27 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-26 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2022-05-26 | House | Accompanied by S1391 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-17 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-11-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2021 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-07-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-07-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S518 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Accompanied S605
S2314 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3674 (Similar To) 2022-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4873
S2198 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H490 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4968
H1456 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S2209 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S624 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S593 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S494 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1391 (Replaces) 2022-05-26 - Accompanied H4036
S1478 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H483 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4968
S2314 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3674 (Similar To) 2022-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4873
S2198 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H490 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4968
H1456 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S2209 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S624 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S593 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S494 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1391 (Replaces) 2022-05-26 - Accompanied H4036
S1478 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H483 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4968
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4036 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4036.pdf |