MA H4048 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4007
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on August 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-05 - See H4007
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-05 - See H4007
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to post-retirement employment of public retirees (see House, No. 4007). August 3, 2021.
Title
Message from His Excellency the Governor returning with his objections thereto in writing the engrossed Bill relative to post-retirement employment of public retirees (see House, No. 4007). August 3, 2021
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-05 | House | See H4007 |
Same As/Similar To
H4007 (Replaced by) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2021
H4047 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4005
H4049 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4008
H4051 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4010
H4053 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4012
H4054 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4014
H4056 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4018
H4678 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - See H4578
H4052 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4011
H4709 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - See H4288
H4047 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4005
H4049 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4008
H4051 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4010
H4053 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4012
H4054 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4014
H4056 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4018
H4678 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - See H4578
H4052 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4011
H4709 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - See H4288
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4048 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4048.pdf |