MA H4068 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on August 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to educational support for children in foster care. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to educational support for children in foster care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-02-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-08-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-08-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-08-12 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H188 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4893
H190 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4896
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
H3954 (Similar To) 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4908
H190 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4896
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
H3954 (Similar To) 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4908
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4068 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4068.pdf |