MA H4069 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4253
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Speliotis of Danvers, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 3869). September 12, 2019.
Title
Relative to the authorities of municipal light boards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Re-enacted and again laid before the Governor |
2020-02-10 | House | Re-enacted |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2020-02-10 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Governor's amendment adopted, in concurrence |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-01-06 | House | Governors amendment adopted (in the form approved by the committee on Bills in the Third Reading) |
2020-01-06 | House | Bills in the Third Reading special report accepted |
2019-12-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2019-12-19 | House | For message, see H4253 |
2019-12-17 | Governor returned to the House with recommendation of amendment | |
2019-12-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2019-12-06 | House | Enacted |
2019-12-06 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2019-12-05 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2019-09-16 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2019-09-12 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2019-09-12 | House | Substituted for H3869 |
Same As/Similar To
H3869 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4069
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3106 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S533 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S785 (Similar To) 2019-06-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2725 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4253 (Replaced by) 2019-12-19 - Placed on file
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3106 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S533 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S785 (Similar To) 2019-06-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2725 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4253 (Replaced by) 2019-12-19 - Placed on file
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4069 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4069.pdf |