MA H4079 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Straus of Mattapoisett, a petition of [PETITIONERS LIST] [BACKING TEXT]. Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently.
Title
Transportation Committee Extension Order
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Senate | Adopted, in concurrence |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-03-14 | House | Adopted |
2016-03-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-03-14 | House | Committee reported ought to be adopted |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H613 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H2180 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H273 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4181
H762 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Accompanied S415
H3100 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2180 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H273 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4181
H762 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Accompanied S415
H3100 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4079 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4079.pdf |