MA H4082 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S235
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to protective headgear for soccer players (House, No. 4082). May 14, 2012. Alice Hanlon Peisch, for the committee.
Title
Relative to protective headgear for soccer players
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-06-11 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-05-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-05-14 | House | New draft of S235 and H1075 |
2012-05-14 | House | Reported from the committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S235 (Replaces) 2012-05-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4082
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4082 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=116379&generalCourtId=1 |