MA H4082 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on August 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a high emissions vehicle retirement program. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to retiring high emissions vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-12-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-08-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-08-19 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4082 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4082.pdf |