MA H4087 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the town manager in the town of Ipswich. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to town manager in the town of Ipswich
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-02-14 | House | Enacted |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-01-18 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-01-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-01-16 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-01-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-12-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-12-21 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H2795 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 39 of the Acts of 2017
H4121 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 110 of the Acts of 2018
H4989 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 380 of the Acts of 2018
H4121 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 110 of the Acts of 2018
H4989 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 380 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4087 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4087.pdf |