MA H4089 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 138 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 138 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to clear and conspicuous price disclosure (House, No. 3491) ought to pass with an amendment substituting a bill with the same title (House, No. 4089). May 14, 2012.
Title
Relative to clear and conspicuous price disclosure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 138 of the Acts of 2012 |
2012-06-25 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-06-25 | House | Enacted |
2012-06-25 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-05-17 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-05-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-05-14 | House | Substituted for H3491 |
2012-05-14 | House | Pending new draft for H3491 |
2012-05-14 | House | Reported from the House committee on Ways and Means |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4089 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=117772&generalCourtId=1 |