MA H4104 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A communication from the Division of Banks (under the provisions of section 2A of Chapter 167 of the General Laws) submitting a summary of proposed amendments to 209 CMR 40.00 et seq., Unfair and Deceptive Practices in Consumer Transactions. Financial Services.
Title
A communication from the Division of Banks (under the provisions of section 2A of Chapter 167 of the General Laws) submitting a summary of proposed amendments to 209 CMR 40.00 et seq., Unfair and Deceptive Practices in Consumer Transactions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-17 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H4727 (Similar To) 2016-11-14 - Senate concurred
S8 (Similar To) -
H2016 (Similar To) 2015-02-19 - Order adopted, see H56
H54 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
S28 (Similar To) 2015-03-19 - Text of S21, printed as amended
H3333 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2015
S50 (Similar To) 2015-04-15 - Passed to be engrossed
H3593 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Placed on file
S8 (Similar To) -
H2016 (Similar To) 2015-02-19 - Order adopted, see H56
H54 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
S28 (Similar To) 2015-03-19 - Text of S21, printed as amended
H3333 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2015
S50 (Similar To) 2015-04-15 - Passed to be engrossed
H3593 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Placed on file
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4104 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4104.pdf |