MA H4108 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H386
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to housing rights for victims of domestic violence (House, No. 4108). May 21, 2012. Kevin G. Honan, for the committee.
Title
Relative to housing rights for victims of domestic violence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-06-18 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-05-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-05-21 | House | New draft of H386 |
2012-05-21 | House | Reported from the committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H386 (Replaces) 2012-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4108
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4108 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=118286&generalCourtId=1 |