MA H4108 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3925
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-22 - Rejected
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-22 - Rejected
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Financing the production and preservation of housing for low and moderate income residents
Title
Financing the production and preservation of housing for low and moderate income residents
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | House | Rejected |
2018-01-11 | House | Pending new draft of H3925 |
2018-01-11 | House | Reported from the committee on House Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
Same As/Similar To
H3925 (Replaces) 2018-01-22 - New draft substituted, see H4134
H4075 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4290
S2130 (Similar To) 2017-07-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2131 (Similar To) 2017-07-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4134 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Reported by H4536
S2344 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Reprinted as amended, see S2373
S94 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2361
H978 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H703 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H4536 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 99 of the Acts of 2018
H4981 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4075 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4290
S2130 (Similar To) 2017-07-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2131 (Similar To) 2017-07-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4134 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Reported by H4536
S2344 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Reprinted as amended, see S2373
S94 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2361
H978 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H703 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H4536 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 99 of the Acts of 2018
H4981 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4108 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4108.pdf |