MA H4110 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Initiative petition of Christina Barnes and others for the passage of An Act establishing a paid family and medical leave insurance program.
Title
Establishing a paid family and medical leave insurance program
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-01-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H2172 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4640
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4110 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4110.pdf |