MA H4113 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1919
Note: Legislation replaced by S2213
Note: Legislation replaced by S2213
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Accompanied S2213
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Accompanied S2213
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prevent death and disability from stroke
Title
To prevent death and disability from stroke
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Senate | Accompanied S2213 |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2016-03-23 | House | New draft of H1919 |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1919 (Replaces) 2016-03-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4113
S2213 (Replaced by) 2016-05-05 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3699 (Similar To) 2016-06-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3700 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3701 (Similar To) 2016-05-25 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1994 (Similar To) 2016-02-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2016
S1993 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - New draft substituted, see S2074
S2213 (Replaced by) 2016-05-05 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3699 (Similar To) 2016-06-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3700 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3701 (Similar To) 2016-05-25 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1994 (Similar To) 2016-02-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2016
S1993 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - New draft substituted, see S2074
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4113 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4113.pdf |