MA H4125 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 190 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 190 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing recall methods for elected officials in the town of Lakeville. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Establishing recall methods for elected officials in the town of Lakeville
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-27 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 190 of the Acts of 2024 | |
2024-08-22 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2024-08-22 | House | Enacted |
2024-08-20 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-08-20 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2024-08-12 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-08-08 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-06-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-06-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-06-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-05-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-21 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 28, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday March 19, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-11-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-10-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-10-12 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H2093 (Similar To) 2023-10-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2023
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4125 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4125.pdf |