MA H4129 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4179
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-06 - New draft substituted, see H4179
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-06 - New draft substituted, see H4179
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to a suitable memorial to commemorate Deborah Sampson. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Resolve establishing a Deborah Sampson memorial commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-06 | House | New draft substituted, see H4179 |
2019-11-06 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2019-11-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-06 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2019-11-06 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2019-11-06 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a resolve with the same title, see H4179 |
2019-10-28 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-10-24 | House | Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2019-10-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-10-10 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
2019-10-07 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S1874 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S971 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2169 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
S2170 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
H3586 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4179 (Replaced by) 2020-07-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
S971 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2169 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
S2170 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
H3586 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4179 (Replaced by) 2020-07-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4129 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4129.pdf |