MA H4129 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representatives Decker of Cambridge and Owens of Watertown, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Marjorie C. Decker and Steven Owens that the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance be authorized to convey a certain parcel of land in the city of Cambridge to said city for school and other municipal purposes. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the commissioner of capital asset management and maintenance to convey a certain parcel of land to the city of Cambridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-10-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-10-12 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2023-09-18 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4700 (Similar To) 2024-06-03 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2822 (Similar To) 2024-06-21 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4795 (Similar To) 2024-06-27 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S2822 (Similar To) 2024-06-21 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4795 (Similar To) 2024-06-27 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4129 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4129.pdf |