MA H4143 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 93 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 93 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Cambridge be authorized to appoint retired police officers as special police officers within said city for paid detail assignments. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Regarding the appointment of retired Cambridge Police Department officers as special police officers within the city of Cambridge for paid detail assignments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 93 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-05-21 | House | Enacted |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-03-26 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2018-03-26 | House | Amendment adopted, as changed |
2018-03-26 | House | Read third (title changed) |
2018-02-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-02-06 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2133 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - See H1100
S1370 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1869 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H3832 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
S2004 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2277
S1477 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1100 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 89 of the Acts of 2017
H4926 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1370 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1869 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H3832 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
S2004 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2277
S1477 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1100 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 89 of the Acts of 2017
H4926 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4143 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4143.pdf |