MA H4146 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4116
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-31 - Text of a further amendment, see H4116
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-31 - Text of a further amendment, see H4116
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Text of a further (offered by Mr. Dempsey of Haverhill) to Senate amendment of the House Bill making appropriations for the fiscal year 2016 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects (House, No. 4116)
Title
Text of a further (offered by Mr. Dempsey of Haverhill) to Senate amendment of the House Bill making appropriations for the fiscal year 2016 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects (House, No. 4116)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Text of a further amendment, see H4116 |
Same As/Similar To
H4116 (Replaced by) 2016-04-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2016
H3330 (Similar To) 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2015
H3332 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - New text for H3203
H1291 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1681 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Accompanied S992
H1474 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3330 (Similar To) 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2015
H3332 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - New text for H3203
H1291 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1681 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Accompanied S992
H1474 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4146 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4146.pdf |