MA H4147 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 22 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 22 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Message from [BACKING TEXT].
Title
Providing the terms of certain bonds to be issued by the Commonwealth
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 22 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-02-12 | House | Enacted |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-02-12 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read, rules suspended. read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-02-08 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-08 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-02-08 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-02-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
Same As/Similar To
H4092 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H37 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1842 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H1044 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3627 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H39 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4890 (Similar To) 2018-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 260 of the Acts of 2018
H37 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1842 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H1044 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3627 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H39 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4890 (Similar To) 2018-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 260 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4147 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4147.pdf |