MA H4152 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to name two bridges over Route 6 in the city known as the town of Barnstable as the first responders appreciation overpasses. Transportation.
Title
Designating certain bridges in the city known as the town of Barnstable as the First Responders Appreciation Overpasses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-04-26 | House | Enacted |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-04-11 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-04-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-08 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-02-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3953 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 32 of the Acts of 2018
H1027 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H3881 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H3888 (Similar To) 2017-11-07 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4013
H3836 (Similar To) 2017-08-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4237 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - New draft substituted, see H4367
H3679 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2017
H1855 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1837 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2017
H1657 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Accompanied H3767
H1027 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H3881 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H3888 (Similar To) 2017-11-07 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4013
H3836 (Similar To) 2017-08-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4237 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - New draft substituted, see H4367
H3679 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2017
H1855 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1837 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2017
H1657 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Accompanied H3767
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4152 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4152.pdf |